blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0989864 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0989864



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 156
16.01.2007 Closing of application Search / examination 1
06.10.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
04.08.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
20.04.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.04.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.04.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
03.02.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.02.2006 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
01.02.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.12.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
23.11.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.11.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.08.2005 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
22.07.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.07.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.10.2004 Description Search / examination 8
14.10.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.06.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
21.06.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.01.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.10.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
12.10.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.09.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
14.09.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.07.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.07.2001 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.03.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
14.03.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.12.1999 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
22.11.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
07.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 30
04.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
04.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 34