blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0989864


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.01.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  21.02.2007  [2007/08]
03.10.2006 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
02.08.2006 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
13.04.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.02.2006 Change - classification published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
17.02.2006 Change - classification published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
04.02.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
19.11.2005 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.10.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
20.10.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.07.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
20.07.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.10.2004 Change - classification published on  15.12.2004  [2004/51]
29.10.2004 Change - classification published on  15.12.2004  [2004/51]
29.10.2004 Change - German title published on  15.12.2004  [2004/51]
19.10.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.07.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
23.07.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
23.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.06.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.06.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.06.2002 Renewal fee
18.01.2002 Examination report or reply
10.10.2001 Examination report or reply
25.09.2001 Examination report or reply
17.07.2001 Examination report or reply
07.07.2001 Renewal fee
09.03.2001 First examination report
08.03.2001 Examination report or reply
21.06.2000 Renewal fee
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
18.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
14.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
20.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
06.01.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication