blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0989864

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
CH 
CY 
DE 
DK 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
SE 
Examination procedure06.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/08]
Entry into regional phase13.12.1999National basic fee paid 
13.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200407   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2004
30.06.200508   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2005
30.06.200609   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19991213
 
Event date:25.04.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010314
 
Event date:15.12.2004 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61K 47/48 A
 
Event date:15.12.2004 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61P 35/00 B
 
Event date:15.12.2004 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ENZYME CONJUGATES IN COMBINATION WITH PRODRUGS
 
Event date:05.04.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 35/00 20060101AFI20060215BHEP
 
Event date:05.04.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 47/48 20060101ALI20060215BHEP
 
Event date:21.02.2007 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20060831