Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989864

EP0989864 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ENZYME CONJUGATES IN COMBINATION WITH PRODRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/14]PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ANTIBODY-ENZYME CONJUGATES IN COMBINATION WITH PRODRUGS
[2004/51]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2007
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.02.2007  [2007/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE SCHOOL OF PHARMACY, UNIVERSITY OF LONDON
29-39 Brunswick Square
London WC1N 1AX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
THE SCHOOL OF PHARMACY, UNIVERSITY OF LONDON
29/39 Brunswick Square
London WC1N 1AX / GB
Inventor(s)01 / DUNCAN, Ruth, The School of Pharmacy
University of London, 29/39 Brunswick Square
London WC1N 1AX / GB
02 / SATCHI-FAINARO, Ronit, DEPARTMENT OF CELL RESEARCH
and Immunology Faculty of Life Sciences
Tel Aviv University Ramat Aviv / IL
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Perry, Robert Edward
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Perry, Robert Edward
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98928451.811.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998GB01700
Priority number, dateEP1997030407011.06.1997         Original published format: EP 97304070
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9856425
Date:17.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0989864
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61P35/00, A61K47/48
[2006/14]
Former International [2004/51]A61K47/48, A61P35/00
Former International [2000/14]A61K47/48
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN, WELCHE ENZYM-KONJUGATE IN VERBINDUNG MIT WIRKSTOFFVORLAEUFERN ENTHALTEN[2004/51]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ENZYME CONJUGATES IN COMBINATION WITH PRODRUGS[2004/51]
French:COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT DES CONJUGUES ENZYMES COMBINES A DES PROMEDICAMENTS[2004/51]
Former [2000/14]PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN, WELCHE ANTIKOERPER-ENZYM-KONJUGATE IN VERBINDUNG MIT WIRKSTOFFVORLAEUFERN ENTHALTEN
Former [2000/14]PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ANTIBODY-ENZYME CONJUGATES IN COMBINATION WITH PRODRUGS
Former [2000/14]COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT DES CONJUGUES ANTICORPS-ENZYMES COMBINES A DES PROMEDICAMENTS
Entry into regional phase13.12.1999National basic fee paid 
13.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
14.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/08]
06.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200407   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2004
30.06.200508   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2005
30.06.200609   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]  - KRINICK NL, "Combination polymeric drugs as anticancer agents.", DISS ABSTR INT [B];52(12):6525 1992, XP002049282 [X] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - NICHIFOR M ET AL, "Macromolecular prodrugs of 5-fluorouracil. 2: Enzymatic degradation", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, 39 (1). 1996. 79-92., XP002040091 [A] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(95)00141-7
 [A]  - NICHIFOR M. ET AL, "Polymeric prodrugs of 5-fluorouracil", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, 1997, 48/2-3 (165-178), NETHERLANDS, XP002049283 [A] 1-19 * page 176, column 2 - page 177, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(97)00048-5
 [A]  - MELTON R G ET AL, "ANTIBODY-ENZYME CONJUGATES FOR CANCER THERAPY", JOURNAL OF THE NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE, (19960221), vol. 88, no. 3/04, pages 153 - 165, XP002038773 [A] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jnci/88.3-4.153
 [AD]  - SENTER P D ET AL, "POLY(ETHYLENE GLYCOL)-DOXURUBICIN CONJUGATES CONTAINING -LACTAMASE-SENSITIVE LINKERS", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (19950701), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 389 - 394, XP000517227 [AD] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc00034a008
 [A]  - WALLACE P M ET AL, "Selective Activation of Anticancer Prodrugs by Monoclonal Antibody-Enzyme Conjugates", METHODS AND FINDINGS IN EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, 16 (7). 1994. 505-512., XP002049284 [A] 1-19 * abstract *