blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0925031

EP0925031 - MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/26]MEDICAL DEVICE AND USE THEREOF
[2001/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 06.10.2004  [2004/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hudson, John
1A, Salcombe Drive Glenfield
Leicester LE3 8AG / GB
For all designated states
Bauer, Alberto
109 2nd Avenue
St. Petersburg Beach, FL 33706 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
Hudson, John
1A, Salcombe Drive
Glenfield, Leicester LE3 8AG / GB
For all designated states
Bauer, Alberto
109 2nd Avenue
St. Petersburg Beach, FL 33706 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/26]
Representative(s)Thomas, Philip John Duval
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]Thomas, Philip John Duval
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date98928473.215.06.1998
[1999/26]
WO1998GB01732
Priority number, dateGB1997001270718.06.1997         Original published format: GB 9712707
GB1998000384624.02.1998         Original published format: GB 9803846
[1999/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9857586
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0925031
Date:30.06.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0925031
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61B17/12, A61B17/00
[1999/26]
CPC:
A61B17/12136 (EP); A61B17/0057 (EP); A61B17/12099 (EP);
A61B17/12172 (EP); A61B17/12195 (EP); A61B2017/00575 (EP);
A61B2017/00592 (EP); A61B2017/00601 (EP); A61B2017/00615 (EP);
A61B2017/00632 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/26]
TitleGerman:MEDIZINISCHES GERÄT[2001/48]
English:MEDICAL DEVICE[2001/48]
French:APPAREIL MEDICAL[2001/48]
Former [1999/26]MEDIZINISCHES GERÄT UND SEINE ANWENDUNG
Former [1999/26]MEDICAL DEVICE AND USE THEREOF
Former [1999/26]APPAREIL MEDICAL ET SON UTILISATION
Entry into regional phase16.03.1999National basic fee paid 
16.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/33]
22.05.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
23.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
22.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2003Fee for grant paid
19.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.09.2003
BE10.09.2003
CH10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
PT17.12.2003
[2004/41]
Former [2004/31]AT10.09.2003
BE10.09.2003
CH10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
PT17.12.2003
Former [2004/28]AT10.09.2003
BE10.09.2003
CH10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
Former [2004/22]AT10.09.2003
CH10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
Former [2004/16]AT10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
Former [2004/14]AT10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
Former [2004/12]FI10.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]US4638803  (RAND ROBERT W [US]) [A] 1,29,40 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5224497  (EHLERS ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1,29,40* abstract *;
 [A]WO9406460  (VITAPHORE CORP [US]) [A] 1-4,29,40 * abstract *;
 [A]US5308326  (ZIMMON DAVID S [US]) [A] 1,29,40 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.