Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990151

EP0990151 - METHODS OF CALIBRATING AND TESTING A SENSOR FOR (IN VIVO) MEASUREMENT OF AN ANALYTE AND DEVICES FOR USE IN SUCH METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.10.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.12.2004  [2004/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELAN CORPORATION, Plc
Monksland Industrial Estate Athlone
County Westmeath / IE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
ELAN CORPORATION P.L.C.
Monksland Industrial Estate
Athlone County Westmeath / IE
Inventor(s)01 / GROSS, Joseph
/
20502 Moshav Mazor / IL
02 / REINGEWIRTZ, Meir
Binyamini Street 24
47205 Ramat Hasharon / IL
03 / KATZ, George, Moshe
Mordey Hagetaot Street 30
75509 Rishon Lezion / IL
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Ryan, Anne Mary , et al
Anne Ryan & Co
2 Crofton Terrace
Dun Laoghaire, County Dublin A96 V6P7 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Ryan, Anne Mary , et al
c/o Anne Ryan & Co. 60 Northumberland Road
Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date98928503.611.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998IE00045
Priority number, dateIE1997000044316.06.1997         Original published format: IE 970443
US1997088154724.06.1997         Original published format: US 881547
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9858250
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0990151
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/416, G01N33/487, A61B5/00, C12Q1/00
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM KALIBRIEREN UND TESTEN EINES SENSORS FÜR IN VIVO MESSUNG EINES ANALYTES, UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM GEBRAUCH DERGLEICHEN VERFAHREN[2000/14]
English:METHODS OF CALIBRATING AND TESTING A SENSOR FOR (IN VIVO) MEASUREMENT OF AN ANALYTE AND DEVICES FOR USE IN SUCH METHODS[2000/14]
French:PROCEDES D'ETALONNAGE ET DE TEST D'UN CAPTEUR SERVANT A MESURER UN ANALYTE IN VIVO ET DISPOSITIFS UTILISES DANS CES PROCEDES[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase22.12.1999National basic fee paid 
22.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
15.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/49]
30.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE4221848  (SALZSIEDER ECKARD DR [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6,7,12,14,15,22,32,43-46,48,49,51,53-55 * page 3, line 29 - page 5, line 11; figures 1-3 *;
 [XY]EP0396788  (DRAEGER NEDERLAND B V [NL]) [X] 37-40 * the whole document * [Y] 41,42;
 [YA]US4805624  (YAO SHANG J [US], et al) [Y] 41,42 * column 10, line 26 - line 54; figure 8 * [A] 1,2,4,6,7,12,14,15,22,32,43-46,48,49,51,53-55;
 [DA]WO9614026  (ELAN MED TECH [IE], et al) [DA] 1,2,4,6,7,12,14,15,22,32,43-46,48,49,51,53-55 * page 11, line 1 - page 17, line 24 * * page 28, line 3 - page 32, line 34; figure - *;
 [A]WO9406019  (VIA MEDICAL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-36,43-55 * page 23, line 31; figure - *;
 [A]WO9413203  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-36,43-55 * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 26; figures 1-3 *
 [Y]  - SCHMIDT F J ET AL, "CALIBRATION OF A WEARABLE GLUCOSE SENSOR", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ARTIFICIAL ORGANS, (19920101), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 55 - 61, XP000567626 [Y] 1,2,4,6,7,12,14,15,22,32,43-46,48,49,51,53-55 * the whole document *
by applicantWO9614026