Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018544

EP1018544 - STOCKER FOR LABORATORY DISHES AND APPARATUS FOR TAKING OUT AND SUPPLYING LABORATORY DISHES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  05.07.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 21.08.2002  [2002/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NITTETSU MINING CO., LTD.
3-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
For all designated states
Sankyo Company Limited
5-1 Nihonbashi Honcho 3-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0023 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
Nittetsu Mining Co., Ltd.
3-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
For all designated states
SANKYO COMPANY LIMITED
5-1 Nihonbashi Honcho 3-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / INABA, Kazuhiro c/o Nittetsu Mining Co, Ltd.
8-1, Oaza Hirai, Hinode-machi
Nishitama-gun, Tokyo / JP
02 / SHIRATORI, Mamoru-Sankyo Company, Limited
2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome,Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-005 / JP
03 / ICHIKAWA, Masato-Sankyo Company, Limited
2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome,Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-0005 / JP
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98928613.322.06.1998
[2000/28]
WO1998JP02772
Priority number, dateJP1997016603723.06.1997         Original published format: JP 16603797
[2000/28]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9859033
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018544
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/28]
Search report(s)International search reportJP30.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP21.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12M1/00, C12M1/22, B65G59/06, G01N1/00, B01L9/00, G01N35/00
[2000/36]
Former International [2000/28]C12M1/00, C12M1/22, B65G59/06, G01N1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/28]
TitleGerman:SPEICHER FÜR LABORPLATTEN UND APPARAT ZUM HERAUSNEHMEN UND VERTEILEN DIESER[2000/28]
English:STOCKER FOR LABORATORY DISHES AND APPARATUS FOR TAKING OUT AND SUPPLYING LABORATORY DISHES[2000/28]
French:CHARGEUR POUR COUPELLES DE LABORATOIRE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE RETIRER ET DE DISTRIBUER DES COUPELLES DE LABORATOIRE[2000/28]
Entry into regional phase23.12.1999Translation filed 
23.12.1999National basic fee paid 
23.12.1999Search fee paid 
23.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
23.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/28]
25.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
13.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/34]
23.03.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US4170861  (FREEDMAN DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6 * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 61 * * column 10, line 6 - line 52 *;
 [A]US4861554  (SAKUMA HAJIME [JP]) [A] 1 * column 14, line 39 - line 61; figures 9,15 *;
 [A]EP0625569  (IUL S A [ES]) [A] 1,4,6 * column 6, line 57 - column 8, line 14; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US4143765  (MOSS III L HOWARD) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]US5573950  (GRAESSLE JOSEF A [DE], et al) [A] 1,4,6 * figure - *
International search[A]JPH06225753  (DAINIPPON SUGAR);
 [A]JPH0361476  (DAINIPPON SUGAR)