Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0920869

EP0920869 - STABLE EXTERNAL PREPARATIONS CONTAINING ACETYLSALICYLIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/23]STABLE ASPIRIN-CONTAINING PREPARATIONS FOR EXTERNAL USE
[2002/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEIKOKU SEIYAKU CO., LTD.
567, Sanbonmatsu
Higashikagawa-shi, Kagawa-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.
567, Sanbonmatsu Higashikagawa-shi
Kagawa-ken / JP
Former [1999/23]For all designated states
TEIKOKU SEIYAKU CO., LTD.
567, Sanbonmatsu, Ochi-cho, Okawa-gun
Kagawa 769-2695 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIZOBUCHI, Noriko
Raionzuhiru-Kochi 1212 10-45, Hijima-cho 2-chome
Kochi-shi, Kochi-ken 780-0066 / JP
02 / HASEGAWA, Yuichi
24-1, Hirano,Kakogawa-cho,Kakogawa-shi
Hyogo 675-0063 / JP
03 / KAWADA, Mitsuhiro
313-22, Machida,Ochi-cho,Ohkawa-gun
Kagawa 769-2515 / JP
04 / HISAICHI, Shin-ichi, 2050-20, Hikami
Miki-cho,Kita-gun
Kagawa 761-0612 / JP
 [2003/23]
Former [2003/22]01 / MIZOBUCHI, Noriko
Raionzuhiro-Kochi 1212 -cho,Ohkawa-gun
10-45, Hijima-cho 2-chome / JP
02 / HASEGAWA, Yuichi
24-1, Hirano,Kakogawa-cho,Kakogawa-shi
Hyogo 675-0063 / JP
03 / KAWADA, Mitsuhiro
313-22, Machida,Ochi-cho,Ohkawa-gun
Kagawa 769-2515 / JP
04 / HISAICHI, Shin-ichi, 2050-20, Hikami
Miki-cho,Kita-gun
Kagawa 761-0612 / JP
Former [1999/23]01 / MIZOBUCHI, Noriko
336-1, Kawahigashi,Ochi-cho,Ohkawa-gun
Kagawa 769-2602 / JP
02 / HASEGAWA, Yuichi
24-1, Hirano,Kakogawa-cho,Kakogawa-shi
Hyogo 675-0063 / JP
03 / KAWADA, Mitsuhiro
313-22, Machida,Ochi-cho,Ohkawa-gun
Kagawa 769-2515 / JP
04 / HISAICHI, Shin-ichi, 2050-20, Hikami
Miki-cho,Kita-gun
Kagawa 761-0612 / JP
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/04]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [1999/23]Kraus, Walter, Dr.
Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date98928620.823.06.1998
[1999/23]
WO1998JP02780
Priority number, dateJP1997016852225.06.1997         Original published format: JP 16852297
[1999/23]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858651
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0920869
Date:09.06.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[1999/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0920869
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/60, A61K47/14, A61K47/18
[2003/03]
Former International [1999/23]A61K31/60, A61K47/14, A61K47/16, A61K47/24, A61K47/44
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT [1999/23]
TitleGerman:STABILE ZUBEREITUNG AUF BASIS VON ACETYLSALICYLSÄURE ZUR ÄUSSEREN ANWENDUNG[2002/51]
English:STABLE EXTERNAL PREPARATIONS CONTAINING ACETYLSALICYLIC ACID[2002/51]
French:PREPARATIONS STABLES A USAGE EXTERNE A BASE D'ACID ACETYLSALICYLIQUE[2002/51]
Former [1999/23]STABILE ZUBEREITUNG AUF BASIS VON ASPIRIN ZUR AUSSEREN ANWENDUNG
Former [1999/23]STABLE ASPIRIN-CONTAINING PREPARATIONS FOR EXTERNAL USE
Former [1999/23]PREPARATIONS STABLES A USAGE EXTERNE A BASE D'ASPIRINE
Entry into regional phase24.02.1999Translation filed 
24.02.1999National basic fee paid 
24.02.1999Search fee paid 
24.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/23]
26.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2003Fee for grant paid
03.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02021780.8  / EP1273300
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]GB469526  (PUTT EG) [X] 1-4,7 * page 1, line 10 - line 21; claim 1 * * page 1, line 82 - line 100; claims 4,5 * * page 1, line 104 - line 106 *;
 [X]WO9704759  (CAL INT LTD ;BYRNE WILLIAM (IE); MCCAFFERTY DERMOT (IE)) [X] 1-4 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 3; claim 1 * * page 3, line 21 - line 23 * * page 5, line 14 - line 27; claim 11 *;
 [X]US4219548  (RELLER HERBERT H) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 13 - line 17; examples 1,2; claim 1 * * column 2, line 52 - line 55 *;
 [X]JPH08113531  ;
 [X]JPS6368528  ;
 [X]JPH08333260  ;
 [X]US4012508  (BURTON VERNA M) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 30 - line 33; examples 1,13,14; claims 1-7 *;
 [X]US4613498  (CROSBY FRANK) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 53 - line 58; claim 1 * * column 2, line 21 - line 23 * * column 2, line 53 - line 64 *;
 [X]GB2144326  (RAFA LABOR LTD) [X] 1,7 * page 1, line 59 - line 80; examples 1,2; claims 1-5 *;
 [PX]EP0784975  (TEIKOKU SEIYAKU KK) [PX] 1,7 * page 3, line 10 - line 14; examples 1-8 * * page 3, line 19 - line 26 *;
 [X]JPH0873346  ;
 [X]WO9312799  (LOHMANN THERAPIE SYST LTS [DE]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 2; example 3; claim 1 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 28, Database accession no. 1996-272720, XP002124809 & JPH08113531 A 19960507 (SEKISUI CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 18, Database accession no. 1988-123655, XP002124812 & JPS6368528 A 19880328 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 09, Database accession no. 1997-095410, XP002124810 & JPH08333260 A 19961217 (KAMINOMOTO HONPO KK) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 21, Database accession no. 1996-205433, XP002124811 & JPH0873346 A 19960319 (SEKISUI CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH0372426  ;
 [X]JPH05246892  ;
 [X]JPH08208487  ;
 [Y]JPS53101539  ;
 [Y]JPH05229949  ;
 [XP]JPH1045599
 [X]  - TSUCHIYA M, ET AL., "PREPARATION OF STABLE ASPIRIN WASHABLE OINTMENT", JOURNAL OF THE NIPPON HOSPITAL PHARMACISTS ASSOCIATION, NIPPON BYOIN YAKUZAISHIKAI, TOKYO,, JP, JP, (19940101), vol. 20, no. 06, ISSN 0914-0670, pages 502 - 508, XP002917234