Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0986891

EP0986891 - A METHOD IN A SUBSCRIBER LINE INTERFACE CIRCUIT AS WELL AS A SUBSCRIBER LINE INTERFACE CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2006/27]
Former [2004/20]For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
Former [2004/18]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / EMERICKS, Anders
Näckrosvägen 20
SE - 169 37 SOLNA / SE
02 / HELLBERG, Henrik, III
Virebergsvägen 26
S-169 30 Solna / SE
03 / ISRAELSSON, Mattias
Helgagatan 36
S-118 58 Stockholm / SE
04 / MALMGREN, Carl-Henrik
Styrmansgatan 50
S-114 60 Stockholm / SE
[2000/19]
Former [2000/12]01 / EMERICKS, Anders
Rosengatan 3A
S-172 31 Sundbyberg / SE
02 / HELLBERG, Henrik, III
Virebergsvägen 26
S-169 30 Solna / SE
03 / ISRAELSSON, Mattias
Helgagatan 36
S-118 58 Stockholm / SE
04 / MALMGREN, Carl-Henrik
Styrmansgatan 50
S-114 60 Stockholm / SE
Representative(s)Banzer, Hans-Jörg , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/39]Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2000/12]Hedberg, Sten Torsten , et al
Ericsson Components AB, Department for IPR, Kista
164 81 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date98928718.028.05.1998
[2000/12]
WO1998SE01018
Priority number, dateSE1997000217406.06.1997         Original published format: SE 9702174
[2000/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9856162
Date:10.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0986891
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0986891
Date:05.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/27]
Search report(s)International search reportSE10.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04M19/00
[2000/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/12]
TitleGerman:TEILNEHMERLEITUNGSSCHNITTSTELLENSCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN[2000/12]
English:A METHOD IN A SUBSCRIBER LINE INTERFACE CIRCUIT AS WELL AS A SUBSCRIBER LINE INTERFACE CIRCUIT[2000/12]
French:PROCEDE CONCERNANT UN CIRCUIT D'INTERFACE D'UNE LIGNE D'ABONNE ET CIRCUIT D'INTERFACE D'UNE LIGNE D'ABONNE[2000/12]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2000National basic fee paid 
07.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
07.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/12]
08.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2006Fee for grant paid
16.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
[2008/16]
Former [2007/21]FI05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
Former [2007/17]FI05.07.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]US5511118  (GORES STANLEY A [CA], et al);
 [A]US5485516  (HAUPTMANN JOERG [AT]);
 [A]US5329588  (WILLOCX EDDIE L M [BE], et al);
 [A]US4853959  (JOHANSSON HANS V [SE])