Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0986758

EP0986758 - DETECTION OF BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE MOLECULES BY USE OF PRE-ACTIVATED CELL-BASED BIOSENSORS IN LIQUID-BASED SEPARATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.10.2006  [2006/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CELLECTRICON AB
MC 2 Kemivägen 9
412 96 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2002/16]For all designated states
CELLECTRICON AB
MC 2 Kemivägen 9
412 96 Göteborg / SE
Former [2002/03]For all designated states
CELLECTRICON AB
Box 3096
400 10 Göteborg / SE
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
A+ Science Invest AB
P.O. Box 3096
400 10 Göteborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / ORWAR, Owe
Vasagatan 35
S-411 37 Göteborg / SE
02 / JARDEMARK, Kent
Tigerstigen 5
S-426 72 V Frölunda / SE
[2000/12]
Representative(s)Adam, Holger , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/16]Adam, Holger, Dr. , et al
Kraus & Weisert, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2000/12]Lindberg, Klas Valter Bo , et al
Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date98928750.303.06.1998
[2000/12]
WO1998SE01058
Priority number, dateSE1997000211204.06.1997         Original published format: SE 9702112
[2000/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9855870
Date:10.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0986758
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0986758
Date:16.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/46]
Search report(s)International search reportSE10.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/567, G01N33/487, C12Q1/02, C12M1/40
[2000/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/12]
TitleGerman:NACHWEIS BIOLOGISCH AKTIVER MOLEKÜLE DURCH VERWENDUNG VON VORAKTIVIERTEN ZELLGESTÜTZTEN BIOSENSOREN IN TRENNSYSTEMEN AUF FLÜSSIGKEITSGRUNDLAGE[2000/12]
English:DETECTION OF BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE MOLECULES BY USE OF PRE-ACTIVATED CELL-BASED BIOSENSORS IN LIQUID-BASED SEPARATION SYSTEMS[2000/12]
French:DETECTION DE MOLECULES BIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIVES A L'AIDE DE CAPTEURS BIOLOGIQUES PRE-ACTIVES A BASE DE CELLULE DANS DES SYSTEMES DE SEPARATION A BASE DE LIQUIDE[2000/12]
Entry into regional phase22.11.1999National basic fee paid 
22.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
22.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/12]
02.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2005Fee for grant paid
25.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
28.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9610170  (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]);
 [A]WO9004645  (MOLECULAR DEVICES CORP [US]);
 [A]US4906779  (WEBER ECKARD [US], et al);
 [A]WO9613721  (NEUROSEARCH AS [DK], et al);
 [A]US5597699  (LANZARA RICHARD G [US]);
 [A]WO9420841  (UNIV WOLLONGONG [AU], et al);
 [A]WO9324629  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al);
 [A]US5114681  (BERTONCINI JOSEPH [US], et al)
Examination   - FARRE ET AL: 'Screening of ion channel receptor agonists using capillary electrophoresis-patch clamp detection with resensitized detector cells' ANAL CHEM vol. 73, 2001, pages 1228 - 1233