Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989967

EP0989967 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR COMPOSTING BIODEGRADABLE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.07.2002
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ostbo, Bertil
Byvägen 84
151 52 Södertälje / SE
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Axelsson, Rolf , et al
Kransell & Wennborg KB Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Axelsson, Rolf , et al
Kransell & Wennborg AB Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date98928812.118.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998SE01193
Priority number, dateSE1997000233218.06.1997         Original published format: SE 9702332
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9857908
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0989967
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0989967
Date:29.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C05F3/06, A47K11/04
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
Extension statesAL13.12.1999
LT13.12.1999
LV13.12.1999
RO13.12.1999
SI13.12.1999
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR KOMPOSTIERUNG VON ABBAUBAREN MATERIALIEN[2000/14]
English:METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR COMPOSTING BIODEGRADABLE MATERIAL[2000/14]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT A COMPOSTER DU MATERIAU BIODEGRADABLE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase13.12.1999National basic fee paid 
13.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
13.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
30.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.06.2001Fee for grant paid
11.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)30.05.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE29.08.2001
FI29.08.2001
NL29.08.2001
DK29.11.2001
PT29.11.2001
SE29.11.2001
GR30.11.2001
ES28.02.2002
[2006/14]
Former [2005/01]BE29.08.2001
FI29.08.2001
NL29.08.2001
DK29.11.2001
PT29.11.2001
SE29.11.2001
GR30.11.2001
FR25.01.2002
ES28.02.2002
Former [2004/04]BE29.08.2001
FI29.08.2001
NL29.08.2001
DK29.11.2001
PT29.11.2001
SE29.11.2001
FR25.01.2002
ES28.02.2002
Former [2003/46]BE29.08.2001
FI29.08.2001
NL29.08.2001
DK29.11.2001
PT29.11.2001
SE29.11.2001
FR25.01.2002
Former [2003/21]BE29.08.2001
FI29.08.2001
NL29.08.2001
PT29.11.2001
SE29.11.2001
FR25.01.2002
Former [2003/09]BE29.08.2001
FI29.08.2001
NL29.08.2001
PT29.11.2001
SE29.11.2001
Former [2002/29]BE29.08.2001
FI29.08.2001
PT29.11.2001
SE29.11.2001
Former [2002/27]FI29.08.2001
PT29.11.2001
SE29.11.2001
Former [2002/20]FI29.08.2001
SE29.11.2001
Former [2002/15]FI29.08.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]NO176592C  (ABRAHAMSEN THORLEIF [NO]);
 [A]WO9608616  (RINGDAL PATENTER AS [NO], et al);
 [A]US3683426  (LAGSTROM GORAN EMIL);
 [A]SE456824  (BOLIN MAURITZ INGF AB [SE])