Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1011865

EP1011865 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR COMMINUTING GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/26]APPARATUS FOR COMMINUTING GLASS
[2001/43]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R & J Hansen, L.L.C.
Suite 530, 1245 Brickyard Road
Salt Lake City, UT 84106 / US
[2000/26]
Inventor(s)01 / HANSEN, Richard, W.
1801 Radcliffe
Eagle, ID 83616 / US
[2000/26]
Representative(s)Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date98928830.305.06.1998
[2000/26]
WO1998US10619
Priority number, dateUS19970048648P05.06.1997         Original published format: US 48648 P
US1998009249905.06.1998         Original published format: US 92499
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9855234
Date:10.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1011865
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998
[2000/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1011865
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:B02C13/04, B02C19/14
[2000/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/26]
TitleGerman:GLASZERKLEINERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN[2001/43]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR COMMINUTING GLASS[2001/43]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE BROYAGE DE VERRE[2001/43]
Former [2000/26]GLASZERKLEINERUNGSVORRICHTUNG
Former [2000/26]APPARATUS FOR COMMINUTING GLASS
Former [2000/26]APPAREIL DE COMMINUTION DE VERRE
Entry into regional phase22.12.1999National basic fee paid 
22.12.1999Search fee paid 
22.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/26]
25.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2002Fee for grant paid
19.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
FR06.11.2002
IT06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
DK06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
DE07.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY05.06.2003
GB05.06.2003
IE05.06.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2007/17]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
FR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
DK06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
DE07.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY05.06.2003
GB05.06.2003
IE05.06.2003
Former [2006/14]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
FR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
SE06.02.2003
DE07.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY05.06.2003
GB05.06.2003
IE05.06.2003
Former [2004/36]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
SE06.02.2003
DE07.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY05.06.2003
GB05.06.2003
IE05.06.2003
Former [2004/29]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
SE06.02.2003
DE07.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
GB05.06.2003
IE05.06.2003
Former [2004/22]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
SE06.02.2003
DE07.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
GB05.06.2003
Former [2004/04]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
SE06.02.2003
DE07.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2004/02]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
SE06.02.2003
DE07.02.2003
Former [2003/51]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/43]AT06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/39]AT06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/37]AT06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/30]NL06.11.2002
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE06.02.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US4193556  (HEMSCHEIDT EGBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,11,18 * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 4 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US3151814  (MORGAN FURMAN D, et al) [A] 1,11,18 * column 2, line 11 - line 47 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US5628467  (GRAVEMAN DONALD F [US]) [A] 1,11,18 * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 53 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]US5630556  (CHRESTENSON ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1,11,18 * figure 5 *
International search[Y]US5628467  (GRAVEMAN DONALD F [US]);
 [Y]US5255869  (SMITH ROGER G [US]);
 [Y]US5775604  (SATO KOEITHI [JP]);
 [Y]US1169907  (APP OLIVER O [US]);
 [Y]US3993256  (BREWER JOHN C);
 [A]US5505390  (RODGERS CHARLES C [US]);
 [A]US5184781  (ANDELA JAMES [US]);
 [A]US4795103  (LECH STANLEY J [US]);
 [A]US3342426  (SACKETT SR WALTER J);
 [A]US5639032  (ROESSLER PETER [DE])