blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0993641 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0993641



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 212
28.10.2010 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
27.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.10.2010 Closing of application Search / examination 2
27.10.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.10.2010 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
06.09.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
30.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
30.08.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
30.08.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.08.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.06.2010 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
04.06.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.05.2010 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.05.2010 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
20.05.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
17.05.2010 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
14.05.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.05.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.06.2009 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 4
16.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 8
16.09.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
18.07.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.07.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.03.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.03.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.10.2006 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
31.10.2006 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
26.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 10
26.10.2006 Description Search / examination 2
26.10.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
26.06.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
26.06.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.04.2006 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
08.03.2006 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
16.02.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.02.2006 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
21.07.2003 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
12.06.2003 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
12.06.2003 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 1
07.08.2001 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
27.03.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.01.2000 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
05.01.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 52
02.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
02.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 60