blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993641


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.10.2010 Withdrawal of application published on  01.12.2010  [2010/48]
28.10.2010 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
28.08.2010 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
29.06.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.06.2010 Change - representative published on  07.07.2010  [2010/27]
08.07.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.09.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.07.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.07.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.03.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.07.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.10.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.06.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.06.2006 First examination report
22.06.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.02.2006 Supplementary search report published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
08.07.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.07.2002 Renewal fee
11.09.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
11.09.2001 Renewal fee
02.08.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
14.06.2000 Renewal fee
03.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
03.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
01.03.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
26.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
19.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
26.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
18.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication