blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0993641
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002504248Global Dossier 05.02.2002A
Priority number Date
US9811438 03.06.1998
US87068897 06.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0993641Global Dossier 05.04.2006A4
EP0993641 19.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9811438 03.06.1998
US87068897 06.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU764321B 14.08.2003B2
AU8057298 21.12.1998A
Priority number Date
US9811438 03.06.1998
US87068897 06.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2292494 18.10.2005C
CA2292494 10.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
US9811438 03.06.1998
US87068897 06.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9855947Global Dossier 10.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
US87068897 06.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5991758 23.11.1999A
Priority number Date
US87068897 06.06.1997