blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0993641

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
CH 
CY 
DE 
DK 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
SE 
Examination procedure07.12.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Entry into regional phase05.01.2000National basic fee paid 
05.01.2000Search fee paid 
05.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
29.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
23.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200104   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2001
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000105
 
Event date:05.04.2006 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20060216
 
Event date:26.07.2006 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20060626
 
Event date:01.12.2010 
Event description:APPLICATION WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20101027