Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993641

EP0993641 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INDEXING INFORMATION ABOUT ENTITIES FROM DIFFERENT INFORMATION SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.10.2010
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2010Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.12.2010  [2010/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Initiate Systems, Inc.
Suite 2800, 200 West Madison Street
Chicago, IL 60606 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Madison Information Technologies, Inc.
Suite 2800, 200 West Madison Street
Chicago, IL 60606 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ELLARD, Scott
39469 Gallaudet Drive 313
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Gascoyne, Belinda Jane , et al
IBM United Kingdom Limited
MP 110
Hursley Park
Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/27]Gascoyne, Belinda Jane , et al
IBM United Kingdom Ltd., MP 110, Hursley Park Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Former [2000/16]Betten & Resch
Reichenbachstrasse 19
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date98928878.203.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998US11438
Priority number, dateUS1997087068806.06.1997         Original published format: US 870688
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9855947
Date:10.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993641
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06F17/60
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM INDEXIEREN VON INFORMATIONEN ÜBER DIE GESAMTHEITEN VON UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN INFORMATIONSQUELLEN[2000/16]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INDEXING INFORMATION ABOUT ENTITIES FROM DIFFERENT INFORMATION SOURCES[2000/16]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT L'INDEXAGE D'INFORMATIONS RELATIVES A DES ENTITES PROVENANT DE SOURCES D'INFORMATION DIFFERENTES[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2000National basic fee paid 
05.01.2000Search fee paid 
05.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
26.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2010Application withdrawn by applicant  [2010/48]
27.10.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.12.2010
07.12.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
29.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
23.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200104   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2001
Documents cited:Search[X]US5497486  (STOLFO SALVATORE J [US], et al) [X] 1-31 * abstract * * column 3 - column 16 *;
 [X]  - FAIR ET AL, "Record linkage in the national dose registry of Canada", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (199704), vol. 33, ISSN 0959-8049, pages S37 - S43, XP005058648 [X] 1-31 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-8049(97)00022-1
 [X]  - MARTHA E. FAIR AND PATRICIA WHITRIDGE, "Tutorial on Record Linkage", RECORD LINKAGE TECHNIQUES INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, CHAPTER 12, ARLINGTON, VA, (19970321), pages 457 - 479, URL: http://www.fcsm.gov/working-papers/RLT97_chap12.html, (20060119), XP002363418 [X] 1-31 * the whole document *
 [X]  - LEICESTER E. GILL, "OX-LINK: The Oxford Medical Record Linkage System", RECORD LINKAGE TECHNIQUES INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, CHAPTER 2, ARLINGTON, VA, (19970321), pages 15 - 33, URL: http://www.fcsm.gov/working-papers/RLT97_chap2.html, (20060119), XP002363419 [X] 1-31 * the whole document *
 [X]  - HOWARD B. NEWCOMBE, MARTHA E. FAIR, AND PIERRE LALONDE, "The Use of Names for Linking Personal Records", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN STATISTICAL ASSOCIATION, USA, vol. 87, (19921201), pages 335 - 349, URL: http://www.fcsm.gov/working-papers/RLT97_chap11.html, (20060119), XP002363425 [X] 1-31 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5583763  (ATCHESON JOHN [US], et al);
 [X]US5333317  (DANN RONALD E [US]);
 [XE]US5765150  (BURROWS MICHAEL [US])