Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991352

EP0991352 - DISPENSING SYSTEM FOR FLOWABLE LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRANDENBURG, Allen, Eugene
1307 Kittansett Cove
Austin, TX 78746 / US
02 / MALDONADO, John, Ethan
2606 Amaranth
Houston, TX 77084 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Davies, Christopher Robert
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date98928913.705.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998US11710
Priority number, dateUS1997088288626.06.1997         Original published format: US 882886
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900043
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991352
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991352
Date:09.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A47K5/12
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:SPENDESYSTEM FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITEN[2000/15]
English:DISPENSING SYSTEM FOR FLOWABLE LIQUIDS[2000/15]
French:SYSTEM DE DISTRIBUTION POUR LIQUIDES FLUIDES[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2000National basic fee paid 
21.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
08.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2003Fee for grant paid
20.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE09.04.2003
FR09.04.2003
IT09.04.2003
NL09.04.2003
SE09.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2004/35]BE09.04.2003
FR09.04.2003
NL09.04.2003
SE09.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
DE01.01.2004
Former [2004/31]BE09.04.2003
NL09.04.2003
SE09.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
DE01.01.2004
Former [2004/28]BE09.04.2003
NL09.04.2003
SE09.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/04]NL09.04.2003
SE09.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/01]NL09.04.2003
SE09.07.2003
Former [2003/41]SE09.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9716107  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1,12,20 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9717879  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1,12,20 * abstract *;
 [A]US5261557  (BYTELL JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1,12,20 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 8; figures 1-13 *;
 [A]US5431304  (GENTILE ALISEO [US])