Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991630

EP0991630 - CRYSTALLINE ROXIFIBAN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.04.2003
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.05.2003  [2003/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Pharma Company
203 Longmeadow Drive
Wilmington, DE 19810 / US
[2002/19]
Former [2002/06]For all designated states
DuPont Pharmaceuticals Company
Chestnut Run Plaza, 974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
THE DU PONT MERCK PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MAURIN, Michael, B.
28 Country Gates Drive
Wilmington, DE 19810 / US
02 / MA, Philip
29 Constitution Drive
Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US
03 / MELONI, David, J.
34 Fantail Court
New Castle, DE 19720 / US
04 / PESTI, Jaan, A.
605 Country Club Drive
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
05 / ROSSANO, Lucius, T.
7 West Ridge Court
Newark, DE 19711 / US
06 / WARD, Randall, K.
5111 East Brigantine Court
Wilmington, DE 19808 / US
07 / YIN, Jianguo
19 Signal Hill Drive
Hockessin, DE 19809 / US
08 / ZHANG, Lin-Hua
90 Gilliotti Road
New Fairfield, CT 06812 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Beacham, Annabel Rose , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/03]Beacham, Annabel Rose , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [2000/15]Pett, Christopher Phineas , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date98929063.012.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998US12367
Priority number, dateUS19970049712P16.06.1997         Original published format: US 49712 P
US19970049633P16.06.1997         Original published format: US 49633 P
US19980080278P01.04.1998         Original published format: US 80278 P
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9857939
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991630
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D261/04, A61K31/42
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
Extension statesLT25.11.1999
LV25.11.1999
RO25.11.1999
SI25.11.1999
TitleGerman:KRISTALLUNE ROXIFIBAN[2000/15]
English:CRYSTALLINE ROXIFIBAN[2000/15]
French:ROXIFIBAN CRISTALLIN[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase25.11.1999National basic fee paid 
25.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
07.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/21]
20.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DY]WO9514683  (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [DY] 1-50 * see pages 153-156,examples 314 a and b; page 261 - page 267; claim - *;
 [Y]  - LIN-HUA ZHANG ET AL, "The enantiospecific synthesis of an isoxazoline.A RGD mimic platelet GPIIb/IIIa antagonist", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., EASTON US, (19970418), vol. 62, no. 8, pages 2466 - 2470, XP002077679 [Y] 1-50 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - LIN-HUA ZHANG ET AL, "The chiral specific synthesis of DMP 754 a platelet GPIIb/IIIa antagonist", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., OXFORD GB, (19960624), vol. 37, no. 26, pages 4455 - 4458, XP002077680 [Y] 1-50 * the whole document *