blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0989948 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0989948



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 105
04.02.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
08.07.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
01.07.2004 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
01.07.2004 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
24.06.2004 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
19.02.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.01.2004 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
24.11.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.11.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
24.11.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
21.11.2003 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
11.09.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
20.02.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
17.02.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) Search / examination 1
14.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
08.02.2003 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
07.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
05.02.2003 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
23.01.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.01.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
23.01.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
27.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
27.06.2002 Description Search / examination 5
27.06.2002 Description Search / examination 5
27.06.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.06.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
22.02.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.02.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.09.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
12.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 14
17.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
17.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 11