blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0989948


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
23.03.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.04.2007  [2007/17]
29.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2005  [2005/24]
22.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
18.03.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.05.2005  [2005/18]
04.02.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  23.03.2005  [2005/12]
28.01.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2005  [2005/11]
29.10.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.12.2004  [2004/51]
03.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.10.2004  [2004/43]
20.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
13.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.09.2004  [2004/40]
10.07.2004 Change - applicant published on  25.08.2004  [2004/35]
13.02.2004 (Expected) grant published on  31.03.2004  [2004/14]
15.01.2004 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
29.12.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.12.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
09.12.2003 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
09.12.2003 Deletion: Decision on request for further processing
05.12.2003 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
28.11.2003 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
09.09.2003 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
22.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.02.2003 Change - applicant published on  09.04.2003  [2003/15]
15.01.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.07.2002 Renewal fee
03.07.2002 Examination report or reply
22.02.2002 First examination report
19.02.2002 Examination report or reply
26.06.2001 Renewal fee
07.07.2000 Renewal fee
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
18.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
01.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
01.02.2000 Change - extension states
09.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication