blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0989948 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP97870090 EP98929138



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0989948Global Dossier 31.03.2004B1
EP0989948 05.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98929138 16.06.1998
BE9800092 16.06.1998
EP97870090 19.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT263094T 15.04.2004T
Priority number Date
BE9800092 16.06.1998
EP97870090 19.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7899898 04.01.1999A
Priority number Date
BE9800092 16.06.1998
EP97870090 19.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69822825T 13.01.2005T2
DE69822825D 06.05.2004D1
Priority number Date
BE9800092 16.06.1998
EP97870090 19.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6421580 16.07.2002B1
Priority number Date
BE9800092 16.06.1998
EP97870090 19.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9858856Global Dossier 30.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
EP97870090 19.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0885816Global Dossier 23.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
EP97870090 19.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2218834T 16.11.2004T3
Priority number Date
EP97870090 19.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT989948E 31.08.2004E
Priority number Date
EP97870090 19.06.1997