blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0989948

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 31.03.2004
 BE 
 CHLapse: 31.03.2004
CYLapse: 31.03.2004
 DE 
 DKLapse: 30.06.2004
 ES 
 FILapse: 31.03.2004
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 30.06.2004
 IELapse: 16.06.2004
 IT 
 LILapse: 31.03.2004
 LULapse: 16.06.2004
 MCLapse: 30.06.2004
 NL 
 PT 
 SELapse: 30.06.2004
Examination procedure21.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase18.01.2000National basic fee paid 
18.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted31.03.2004
Opposition procedure04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit published on 16.03.2005 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:RO PAYMENT 20000118
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000118
 
Event date:10.04.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20020222
 
Event date:09.04.2003 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:DE NAAMLOZE VENNOOTSCHAP: "NEW DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM
 
Event date:31.03.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20040331
 
Event date:31.03.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20040331
 
Event date:31.03.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20040331
 
Event date:31.03.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20040331
 
Event date:31.03.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20040331
 
Event date:31.03.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:31.03.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:31.03.2004 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:RO
 
Event date:31.03.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:05.05.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:06.05.2004 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69822825
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20040506
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:16.06.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040616
 
Event date:16.06.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040616
 
Event date:30.06.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20040630
 
Event date:30.06.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20040630
 
Event date:30.06.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040630
 
Event date:30.06.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20040630
 
Event date:18.08.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
 
Event date:25.08.2004 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:VTL GROUP LIMITED
 
Event date:31.08.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20040630
 
Event date:01.10.2004 
Event description:NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN
Owner Name:VTL GROUP LIMITED
 
Event date:15.10.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:16.11.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2218834 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:01.12.2004 
Event description:NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS
Owner Name:VTL GROUP LIMITED
 
Event date:31.12.2004 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:04.02.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:23.03.2005 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20050104
 
Event date:06.04.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:24.12.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT MM4A
Code Expl.:-ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT
Free Format Text:LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES
Effective DATE:20091216
 
Event date:08.01.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT NF4A
Code Expl.:+RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM
Free Format Text:RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM
Effective DATE:20100106
 
Event date:31.03.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20091216
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Effective DATE:20100106
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20140611
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20140611
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20140616
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20140611
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20140620
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20140611
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20140610
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20140609
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:24.12.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT MM4A
Code Expl.:-ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT
Free Format Text:LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES
Effective DATE:20151216
 
Event date:01.01.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 69822825 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150616
 
Event date:24.02.2016 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20150616
 
Event date:29.02.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20151216
 
Event date:02.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MM
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20150701
 
Event date:01.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20160229
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150701
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150616
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160101
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150630
 
Event date:28.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20160728
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150617
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150630