Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989948

EP0989948 - DISTRIBUTING EQUIPMENT FOR PIECE GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.02.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.03.2016  [2016/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VTL Group Limited
Level 18 Forsyth Barr Frater Williams Tower 55-65 Shortland Street
Auckland 1 / NZ
[2004/35]
Former [2003/15]For all designated states
de naamloze vennootschap: "New Distribution Systems" in het kort "N.D.S."
Van Doornelaan 2A
2440 Geel / BE
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
de naamloze vennootschap: "New Distribution Systems" in het kort "N.D.S."
Dikberd 18
2200 Herentals / BE
Inventor(s)01 / ROBRECHTS, Jozef
Merkplassesteenweg 111
B-2310 Rijkevorsel / BE
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Callewaert, Jean
Bureau Callewaert b.v.b.a.
Brusselsesteenweg 108
3090 Overijse / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Callewaert, Jean
Bureau Callewaert p.v.b.a. Brusselsesteenweg 108
3090 Overijse / BE
Application number, filing date98929138.016.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998BE00092
Priority number, dateEP1997087009019.06.1997         Original published format: EP 97870090
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858856
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0989948
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0989948
Date:31.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B65G1/00, B65G1/04, G07F11/62
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
Extension statesRO18.01.2000
TitleGerman:AUSGABEEINRICHTUNG FÜR STÜCKGUT[2000/14]
English:DISTRIBUTING EQUIPMENT FOR PIECE GOODS[2000/14]
French:MATERIEL DE DISTRIBUTION DE MARCHANDISES A LA PIECE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2000National basic fee paid 
18.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
22.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
21.11.2003Fee for grant paid
21.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Request for further processing for:21.11.2003Request for further processing filed
21.11.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.01.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
CY31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
IE16.06.2004
LU16.06.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
[2016/11]
Former [2007/17]AT31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
CY31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
IE16.06.2004
LU16.06.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2005/24]AT31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
IE16.06.2004
LU16.06.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2005/23]AT31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
LU16.06.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2005/18]AT31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2005/11]AT31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/51]AT31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI31.03.2004
SE30.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0349284  (FLIXCORP OF AMERICA LTD [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 6, line 25 - line 48; figures 1,4-6 * * column 10, line 62 - column 11, line 28 * [Y] 2;
 [XAY]US4428708  (BURT HAROLD S [US]) [X] 1 * column 9, line 32 - column 14, line 47; figures 3-6,9,10 * [A] 3 [Y] 2;
 [A]WO8901675  (MIDWAY VIDEO LTD [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 28; figures 1,2,8-10 *