Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991502

EP0991502 - SCREWDRIVER WITH DUAL CAM SLOT FOR COLLATED SCREWS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Habermehl, G., Lyle
436 Calvert Drive
Gallatin, TN 37066 / US
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Lock, Howard John , et al
Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Lock, Howard John , et al
Swindell & Pearson, 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Application number, filing date98929177.819.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998CA00601
Priority number, dateUS1997088232325.06.1997         Original published format: US 882323
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900221
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991502
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991502
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B25B23/04, F16B27/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHRAUBENDREHER MIT DOPPELNOCKENSCHLITZ FÜR SCHRAUBENBÄNDER[2000/15]
English:SCREWDRIVER WITH DUAL CAM SLOT FOR COLLATED SCREWS[2000/15]
French:TOURNEVIS DOTE D'UNE FENTE POUR DEUX CAMES, POUR VIS RETENUES ENSEMBLE PAR UNE BANDE[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase31.12.1999National basic fee paid 
10.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
05.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2002Fee for grant paid
16.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
IT04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
DK04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2007/17]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
DK04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2005/21]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
PT13.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
PT13.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/48]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/22]GR04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR04.09.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0738564  (MAX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 6, line 20 - line 44 * * column 7, line 2 - line 25 * * claims 1,3-5 * * figures 6-9,13 *;
 [A]DE3141248  (SANYO IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,10 * abstract * * claims 1,2 * * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 11, line 1 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]GB2147873  (SFS STADLER AG) [A] 1,2,10 * abstract * * figure 24 * * page 1, line 113 - line 128 * * page 4, line 115 - page 5, line 32 * * page 5, line 120 - page 6, line 13 * * claims 13,19,20 *;
 [A]DE4119925  (MAX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figures 5,8,9 *