Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1005740

EP1005740 - A METHOD OF TRANSMITTING DATA IN A RING-SHAPED TELETRANSMISSION NETWORK, SUCH AS A NETWORK AND A NETWORK ELEMENT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2006
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TELLABS DENMARK A/S
Lautrupbjerg 7-11
2750 Ballerup / DK
[2000/23]
Inventor(s)01 / ELLEGAARD, Lars
Obovej 22
DK-2730 Herlev / DK
02 / SCHIELLERUP, Gert
Thorsvej 4 B
DK-3460 Birker d / DK
[2000/23]
Representative(s)Boesen, Johnny Peder , et al
Zacco Denmark A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [2000/23]Boesen, Johnny Peder , et al
Hofman-Bang A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Application number, filing date98929240.426.06.1998
[2000/23]
WO1998DK00282
Priority number, dateDK1997000076827.06.1997         Original published format: DK 76897
[2000/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9900943
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1005740
Date:07.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1005740
Date:22.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE18.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/437, H04J3/08
[2000/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/23]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN IN EINEM RINGFÖRMIGEN FERNÜBERTRAGUNGSNETZ SOWIE NETZWERK UND NETZWERKELEMENT DAFÜR[2000/23]
English:A METHOD OF TRANSMITTING DATA IN A RING-SHAPED TELETRANSMISSION NETWORK, SUCH AS A NETWORK AND A NETWORK ELEMENT THEREFOR[2000/23]
French:PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES DANS UN RESEAU DE TELETRANSMISSION A CONFIGURATION ANNULAIRE, RESEAU CORRESPONDANT ET ELEMENT DE RESEAU A CET EFFET[2000/23]
Entry into regional phase28.12.1999National basic fee paid 
28.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/23]
10.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2005Fee for grant paid
19.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI22.02.2006
IT22.02.2006
[2008/16]
Former [2006/36]FI22.02.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0506396  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]);
 [A]US5159595  (FLANAGAN THOMAS P J [CA], et al);
 [A]US5179548  (SANDESARA NIRANJAN B [US])