Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979036

EP0979036 - ENZYME CONCENTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.06.2003
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2002/14]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
KNOLL AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Knollstrasse 32
67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GUTHRIE, Walter, Graham
Ruddington Fields Business Park Mere Way
Ruddington Nottingham NG11 6JS / GB
02 / ROPER, David, Vincent
Ruddington Fields Business Park Mere Way
Ruddington Nottingham NG11 6JS / GB
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Goldscheid, Bettina , et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C 6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Goldscheid, Bettina , et al
BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C6Y
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Application number, filing date98929263.624.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998EP02451
Priority number, dateGB1997000864129.04.1997         Original published format: GB 9708641
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9849272
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0979036
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979036
Date:07.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:A01N63/00, C12N9/02, C12N9/04, C12N9/08, A61K7/00
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/10]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesAL29.09.1999
LT26.09.1999
LV29.09.1999
RO29.09.1999
SI29.09.1999
TitleGerman:ENZYM-KONZENTRAT[2000/07]
English:ENZYME CONCENTRATE[2000/07]
French:CONCENTRE ENZYMATIQUE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase29.09.1999National basic fee paid 
29.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
23.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2002Fee for grant paid
18.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Former [2007/17]LU30.04.2003
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9526137  (BOOTS CO PLC [GB], et al) [DA] 1,2 * see the whole document and specially pages 2-5 and example 2 *;
 [DA]WO9111105  (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [DA] 1,4,6 * see the whole document and specially examples 26 and 32 *;
 [A]WO9201466  (UNIV BRUXELLES [BE]) [A] 1,4 * see the whole document, specially tables and examples. *;
 [A]US5453284  (PELLICO MICHAEL A [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2685202  (SEDERMA SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 8-34 - lines 20-32 *;
 [A]WO8802600  (POULSEN OTTO MELCHIOR [DK]) [A] 1 * pages 12-17 *