Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979376

EP0979376 - REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.07.2003  [2003/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Hochstrasse 17
81669 München / DE
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / ALTHAMMER, Hans
Rebhuhnweg 12
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
02 / JOKSCH, Harald
Heideweg 20
D-89269 Vöhringen / DE
03 / LIPP, Walter
Wittislingerstrasse 8
D-89437 Haunsheim / DE
04 / LIMBÄCHER, Manfred
Im Lachmahd 17a
D-89428 Syrgenstein / DE
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Thoma, Lorenz , et al
BSH Hausgeräte GmbH
Zentralabteilung Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Thoma, Lorenz , et al
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH, Hochstrasse 17
81669 München / DE
Application number, filing date98929270.128.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998EP02515
Priority number, dateDE1997207866U30.04.1997         Original published format: DE 29707866 U
[2000/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9849507
Date:05.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979376
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979376
Date:17.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:F25D27/00, F25D29/00, F25D11/02
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/07]
Extension statesSI21.10.1999
TitleGerman:KÜHLGERÄT[2000/07]
English:REFRIGERATOR[2000/07]
French:REFRIGERATEUR[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase21.10.1999National basic fee paid 
21.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
24.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2002Fee for grant paid
19.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0161967  (SELNOR [FR]) [A] 1,6;
 [A]DE4208144  (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]) [A] 1,3,6;
 [A]DE4210603  (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT])