Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0988244

EP0988244 - DEVICE FOR DISCHARGING MATERIAL FROM A SILO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PUTZMEISTER Aktiengesellschaft
Max-Eyth-Strasse 10
72631 Aichtal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
PUTZMEISTER Aktiengesellschaft
Max-Eyth-Strasse 10
72631 Aichtal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ZEY, Wolfgang
Reutlinger Strasse 58
D-72800 Eningen / DE
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Wolf, Eckhard , et al
Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB
Tübinger Strasse 26
70178 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Wolf, Eckhard, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93
70193 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98929290.908.05.1998
[2000/13]
WO1998EP02711
Priority number, dateDE199712335704.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19723357
[2000/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9855382
Date:10.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0988244
Date:29.03.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998
[2000/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0988244
Date:16.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B65G65/44, B65D88/66
[2000/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/13]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN MATERIALAUSTRAG AUS EINEM SILO[2000/13]
English:DEVICE FOR DISCHARGING MATERIAL FROM A SILO[2000/13]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR EXTRAIRE DES MATERIAUX D'UN SILO[2000/13]
Entry into regional phase29.05.1999National basic fee paid 
29.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/13]
07.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
27.08.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
14.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2002Fee for grant paid
22.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]DE9403005U  (SAXLUND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3906253  (SAXLUND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3039598  (GOSTA MILDH) [A] 1,2,18 * column W *