blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0985024

EP0985024 - FREE-FLOWING PARTICULATE DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:DE  ES  FR  IT 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/36]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House, Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:DE  ES  FR  IT 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [2000/11]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:DE  ES  FR  IT 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / EMERY, William, Derek
Unilever Research Port Sunlight Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral Merseyside L63 3JW / GB
02 / GROOT, Andreas Theodorus Johannes Unilever Research
Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120
NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
03 / INSTONE, Terry
Unilever Research Port Sunlight Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral Merseyside L63 3JW / GB
04 / LIEM, Seeng, Djiang Unilever Research Vlaardingen
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
05 / METCALFE, Kenneth
Unilever Reseaarch Port Sunlight Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral Merseyside L63 3JW / GB
06 / SMITH, Richard, George
Unilever Research Port Sunlight Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral Merseyside L63 3JW / GB
07 / VERSCHELLING, Gilbert, Martin Unilever Reserach
Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120
NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Elliott, Peter William, et al
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford
MK44 1LQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]Elliott, Peter William, et al
Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford
MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [2003/49]Elliott, Peter William, et al
Unilever PLC Patent Department, Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [2000/11]Fransella, Mary Evelyn, et al
Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Application number, filing date98929352.711.05.1998
[2000/11]
WO1998EP02987
Priority number, dateGB1997001135930.05.1997         Original published format: GB 9711359
GB1997001135230.05.1997         Original published format: GB 9711352
GB1998000889724.04.1998         Original published format: GB 9808897
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9854289
Date:03.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0985024
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0985024
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:C11D17/06, C11D11/00
[2000/11]
CPC:
C11D3/06 (EP,US); C11D1/02 (EP,US); C11D1/66 (EP,US);
C11D1/83 (EP,US); C11D17/06 (EP,US); C11D17/065 (EP,US);
C11D3/128 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/11]
TitleGerman:RIESELFÄHIGE KÖRNIGE WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2000/11]
English:FREE-FLOWING PARTICULATE DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS[2000/11]
French:COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES PARTICULAIRES A ECOULEMENT FLUIDE[2000/11]
Entry into regional phase09.11.1999National basic fee paid 
09.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/11]
07.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2003Fee for grant paid
20.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2050560  (COLGATE-PALMOLIVE CO.) [A] 1* example 1 *;
 [X]FR2356718  (CHURCH & DWIGHT CO INC [US]) [X] 1-5,8,10,12,14,17,18 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 20; example 7 *;
 [A]US4524010  (REUTER HERBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-5,8-12 * column 2, line 25 - column 5, line 59 *;
 [A]EP0430328  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-12,17,18 * page 2, line 45 - page 5, line 25; examples 1-3 *;
 [X]WO9502682  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,10,12 * page 9, line 6 - page 16, line 5 *;
 [A]GB2301835  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-5,8-12 * examples 1-7; claims 1-6 *;
 [PX]WO9732005  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [PX] 1-12,14,17,18 * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 11; examples 1-12 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.