Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0988052

EP0988052 - AN INFLUENZA ENVELOPED DNA VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHWEIZ. SERUM- & IMPFINSTITUT BERN
P.O. Box 2707
CH-3001 Bern / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
SCHWEIZ. SERUM- & IMPFINSTITUT BERN
P.O. Box 2707
CH-3001 Bern / CH
Inventor(s)01 / CUSI, Maria, Grazia
Via B. Buozzi, 61
I-53100 Siena / IT
02 / GLÜCK, Reinhard
Chasseralstrasse 156
CH-3095 Bern-Spiegel / CH
03 / WÄLTI, Ernst
Moosgasse 84
CH-3053 Münchenbuchsee / CH
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/13]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98929369.122.05.1998
[2000/13]
WO1998EP03050
Priority number, dateEP1997010839023.05.1997         Original published format: EP 97108390
[2000/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9852603
Date:26.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0988052
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998
[2000/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/165, A61K39/145, A61K9/127, A61K48/00
[2000/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/13]
TitleGerman:UMHÜLLTES INFLUENZA DNA VAKZIN[2000/13]
English:AN INFLUENZA ENVELOPED DNA VACCINE[2000/13]
French:VACCIN COMPRENANT DE L'ADN A ENVELOPPE DU VIRUS DE LA GRIPPE[2000/13]
Entry into regional phase23.12.1999National basic fee paid 
23.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/13]
01.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2005Date of oral proceedings
28.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/21]
09.12.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9219267  (SCHWEIZ SERUM & IMPFINST [CH]) [Y] 1-11,13-16 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9640962  (MEGABIOS CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-11,13-16 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5550289  (EPPSTEIN DEBORAH A [US], et al) [Y] 1-11,13-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9425600  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al) [X] 12-16 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0305229  (TRANSGENE SA [FR]) [Y] 12-16 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9510632  (UNIV EMORY [US]) [Y] 12-16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - STERNBERG B, "MORPHOLOGY OF CATIONIC LIPOSOME/DNA COMPLEXES IN RELATION TO THEIR CHEMICAL COMPOSITION", JOURNAL OF LIPOSOME RESEARCH, (199608), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 515 - 533, XP002048618 [Y] 1-11,13-16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - KATO T ET AL, "SYNTHETIC CATIONIC AMPHIPHILE FOR LIPOSOME-MEDIATED DNA TRANSFECTION WITH LESS CYTOTOCICITY", BIOLOGICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN (OF JAPAN), (19960601), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 860 - 863, XP000594656 [Y] 1-11,13-16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - WASAN E K ET AL, "PLASMID DNA IS PROTECTED AGAINST ULTRASONIC CAVITATION-INDUCED DAMAGE WHEN COMPLEXED TO CATIONIC LIPOSOMES", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (19960401), vol. 85, no. 4, pages 427 - 433, XP000558752 [Y] 1-11,13-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js9504752
 [Y]  - WILD ET AL., "CONSTRUCTION OF VACCINIA VIRUS RECOMBINANTS EXPRESSING SEVERAL MEASLES VIRUS PROTEINS AND ANALYSIS OF THEIR EFFICACY IN VACCINATION OF MICE", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (199202), vol. 173, no. 2, pages 359 - 367, XP002097543 [Y] 12-16 * the whole document *