blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0991808


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.03.2002 Refusal of application published on  24.04.2002  [2002/17]
15.11.2001 Application refused
14.08.2001 Examination report or reply
01.06.2001 Renewal fee
18.05.2001 First examination report
16.05.2001 Examination report or reply
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
25.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
17.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
17.12.1999 Renewal fee
09.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
05.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication