blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0991808
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0991808Global Dossier 12.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
FR9801178 09.06.1998
FR9707445 16.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2296170 23.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
FR9801178 09.06.1998
FR9707445 16.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9858119Global Dossier 23.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
FR9707445 16.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2764614 03.09.1999B1
FR2764614 18.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
FR9707445 16.06.1997