Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991808

EP0991808 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR THE CONTINUOUS PREPARATION OF PAPER PULP FROM LIGNOCELLULOSE TEXTILE FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  08.03.2002
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 24.04.2002  [2002/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CLEXTRAL
Tour Framatome, 1 place de la Coupole
F-92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / COMBETTE, Philippe
12, rue de la Collière
F-42490 Fraisses / FR
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Lanceplaine, Jean-Claude , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Lanceplaine, Jean-Claude , et al
CABINET LAVOIX 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date98929527.409.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998FR01178
Priority number, dateFR1997000744516.06.1997         Original published format: FR 9707445
[2000/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858119
Date:23.12.1998
Language:FR
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991808
Date:12.04.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:D21C5/00, D21C3/24, D21C9/10, D21C1/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG EINES PAPIERZELLSTOFFS AUS LIGNOCELLULOSISCHEN FASERN[2000/15]
English:METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR THE CONTINUOUS PREPARATION OF PAPER PULP FROM LIGNOCELLULOSE TEXTILE FIBRES[2000/15]
French:PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE PREPARATION EN CONTINU D'UNE PATE A PAPIER A PARTIR DE FIBRES TEXTILES LIGNOCELLULOSIQUES[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase10.12.1999National basic fee paid 
10.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
21.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/17]
01.12.2001Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9720102  (CLEXTRAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0336842  (CLEXTRAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1564084  (DAISHOWA ENG CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *