blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0990021

EP0990021 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO THE CLEANSING OF SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.09.2004  [2004/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited
103-105 Bath Road Slough
Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/28]For all designated states
Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited
103-105 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
RECKITT & COLMAN PRODUCTS LIMITED
One Burlington Lane
London W4 2RW / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CORNELIUS, Gay
57 The Wolds,Cottingham
East Yorkshire HU16 5LQ / GB
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Dickson, Elizabeth Anne
Reckitt Benckiser plc Group Patents Department, Dansom Lane
Hull HU8 7DS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/46]Dickson, Elizabeth Anne
Reckitt Benckiser plc, Group Patents Department, Dansom Lane
Hull HU8 7DS / GB
Former [2000/14]Johnstone, Helen Margaret
Reckitt Benckiser plc, Group Patents Department, Dansom Lane
Hull HU8 7DS / GB
Application number, filing date98929551.412.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998GB01727
Priority number, dateGB1997001302320.06.1997         Original published format: GB 9713023
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9859026
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990021
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990021
Date:17.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:C11D3/00, C11D17/04, C11D3/37, C11D3/12, C11D3/02
[2000/14]
CPC:
C11D3/48 (EP,US); A01N25/16 (EP,US); A01N59/16 (EP,US);
C11D17/041 (EP,US); C11D17/049 (EP,US); C11D3/02 (EP,US);
C11D3/1213 (EP,US); C11D3/3726 (EP,US); C11D7/10 (EP,US);
C11D7/20 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
A01N59/16, A01N2300/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/14]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN IN BEZUG AUF DIE REINIGUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN[2000/14]
English:IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO THE CLEANSING OF SURFACES[2000/14]
French:AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES AU NETTOYAGE DE SURFACES[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2000National basic fee paid 
17.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
20.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2003Fee for grant paid
14.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
[2004/28]
Former [2004/13]NL17.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]NL9500096  (SATOSEN CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,10 * claim - *;
 [Y]US4476251  (CIANCIOLO ALFRED D [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * column 1, line 49 - line 64; example -; claim - *;
 [Y]WO9723594  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * page 36, line 10 - line 15; claim - * * page 2, paragraph 2 *;
 [T]US4203857  (DUGAN BERNARD B [ZA]) [T] 1,3,4 * column 8, line 60 - line 66 *;
 [A]US3283357  (DECKER JOHN W, et al) [A] 1-17 * claim - *;
 [DA]EP0251783  (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [DA] 1-17 * claim - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.