Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994780

EP0994780 - INK JET COLOUR PRINTER AND RELATIVE METHOD OF OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.07.2002
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.09.2002  [2002/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olivetti Tecnost S.p.A.
via Jervis 77
10015 Ivrea (TO) / IT
[2001/28]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Olivetti Lexikon S.p.A.
via Jervis 77
10015 Ivrea (TO) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / COLOMBI, Alberto
Via Gino Pistoni, 14
I-10010 Banchette / IT
02 / DE AMBROGIO, Attilio
C.so Umberto 1o, 77
I-13046 Cigliano / IT
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Casuccio, Carlo , et al
Olivetti S.p.A. Via G. Jervis 77
10015 Ivrea (Torino) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Casuccio, Carlo , et al
Olivetti S.p.A. Via G. Jervis 77
10015 Ivrea (Torino) / IT
Application number, filing date98929651.230.06.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998IT00183
Priority number, dateIT1997TO0061209.07.1997         Original published format: IT TO970612
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902348
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994780
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994780
Date:12.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B41J13/10, B41J17/32, B65H1/04
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/17]
TitleGerman:TINTENSTRAHLFARBDRUCKER UND ENTSPRECHENDES BETRIEBSVERFAHREN[2000/17]
English:INK JET COLOUR PRINTER AND RELATIVE METHOD OF OPERATION[2000/17]
French:IMPRIMANTE COULEUR A JETS D'ENCRE ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE CELLE-CI[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase01.02.2000National basic fee paid 
01.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
22.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2001Fee for grant paid
16.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH03240541  ;
 [X]US5067835  (YAMAMOTO TAKEMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,11-16 * column 1, line 1 - column 8, line 33 *;
 [X]JPH01105769  ;
 [A]US5053814  (TAKANO YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3-6,15,16 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 17 * * column 7, line 16 - line 31 *;
 [A]JPH04260540
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920124), vol. 016, no. 030, Database accession no. (M - 1203), [X] 1,11-16 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890720), vol. 013, no. 320, Database accession no. (M - 853), [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930126), vol. 017, no. 041, Database accession no. (M - 1359), [A] 4-9 * abstract *