Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102482

EP1102482 - RECORDED PROGRAM VIEWING SUPPORT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.2010
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.01.2011  [2011/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2010/07]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAGAWA, Yuichi Hitachi Ltd.
1099, Ouzenji, Asao-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kangawa 215-0013 / JP
02 / UKAI, Hiromi Hitachi Ltd.
1099, Ouzenji, Asao-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 215-0013 / JP
03 / TANAKA, Akira Hitachi Ltd.
1099, Ouzenji, Asao-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 215-0013 / JP
04 / NISHIJIMA, Hideo R & D Division Hitachi, Ltd.
292, Yoshida-cho, Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-0817 / JP
05 / OWASHI, Hitoaki R & D Division, Hitachi Ltd.
292, Yoshida-cho, Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-0817 / JP
 [2009/37]
Former [2001/21]01 / YAGAWA, Yuichi, Hitachi Ltd.
1099, Ouzenji, Asao-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kangawa 215-0013 / JP
02 / UKAI, Hiromi, Hitachi Ltd.
1099, Ouzenji, Asao-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 215-0013 / JP
03 / TANAKA, Akira, Hitachi Ltd.
1099, Ouzenji, Asao-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 215-0013 / JP
04 / NISHIJIMA, Hideo, R & D Division Hitachi, Ltd.
292, Yoshida-cho, Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-0817 / JP
05 / OWASHI, Hitoaki, R & D Division, Hitachi Ltd.
292, Yoshida-cho, Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-0817 / JP
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2001/21]
Application number, filing date98929784.101.07.1998
[2001/21]
WO1998JP02962
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0002386
Date:13.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1102482
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1102482
Date:17.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.01.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/34, H04N5/445, G11B27/10, H04N5/775, G11B15/02, G11B27/032, G11B27/034, H04N5/78
[2005/52]
Former International [2001/21]H04N5/78, G11B27/032, G11B15/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/21]
TitleGerman:UNTERSTÜTZUNGSMETHODE ZUR BETRACHTUNG VON AUFGEZEICHNETEN PROGRAMMEN[2001/21]
English:RECORDED PROGRAM VIEWING SUPPORT METHOD[2001/21]
French:METHODE DE SUPPORT DE VISUALISATION D'EMISSION ENREGISTREE[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase21.09.2000Translation filed 
24.01.2001National basic fee paid 
24.01.2001Search fee paid 
24.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
24.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
03.03.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2009Fee for grant paid
16.12.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.11.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
24.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
16.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
21.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[E]WO9965237  (METABYTE INC [US]) [E] 1-20 * abstract * * page 2, line 7 - line 17 * * page 3, line 14 - line 27 * * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 11 * * page 7, line 17 - page 12, line 40 * * page 15, line 3 - line 9 * * page 16, line 10 - line 22 * * page 22, line 14 - page 23, line 2 *;
 [Y]EP0825770  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6,9-20 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JPH0745050  ;
 [Y]WO9204801  (INSIGHT TELECAST INC [US]) [Y] 1-6,9-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5047867  (STRUBBE HUGO J [US], et al) [A] 1-6,9,10,16,17,20 * column W *;
 [A]GB2295714  (HASHIMOTO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,17-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9414284  (DISCOVERY COMMUNICAT INC [US]) [A] 1,2,17 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, [Y] 1,2,17-20 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH0745050  (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN);
 [Y]JPH0489682  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH09294237  (HITACHI LTD)