Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995407

EP0995407 - ARTIFICIAL TOOTH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Uji, Hideyo
6F, 1-16, Ginza 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0061 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Uji, Hideyo
6F, 1-16, Ginza 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0061 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
c/o Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date98929838.506.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998JP03021
Priority number, dateJP1997021887510.07.1997         Original published format: JP 21887597
JP1998018131326.05.1998         Original published format: JP 18131398
JP1998022509906.07.1998         Original published format: JP 22509998
[2000/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9849882
Date:12.11.1996
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995407
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1996
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61C13/00
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:KUNSTZAHN[2000/17]
English:ARTIFICIAL TOOTH[2000/17]
French:DENT ARTIFICIELLE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2000Translation filed 
04.02.2000National basic fee paid 
04.02.2000Search fee paid 
04.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
04.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
27.07.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS54129798  (WADA KOUKI);
 [X]JPS59189839  (WADA SEIMITSU SHIKEN);
 [X]JPS61265139  (SHICHIKUMA ISAMU);
 [X]JPH04364838  (SHOFU KK)
by applicantJPH0767890