Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1046648

EP1046648 - 3'-DEOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE INSTITUTE OF PHYSICAL & CHEMICAL RESEARCH
2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi
Saitama 351-0198 / JP
For all designated states
Wako Pure Chemical Industies, Ltd.
1-2, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0045 / JP
For all designated states
Nippon Genetech Co. Ltd.
Kongo Nishiki-cho, Bldg., 5, Kanda-Nishiki-cho, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0054 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/14]For all designated states
THE INSTITUTE OF PHYSICAL & CHEMICAL RESEARCH
2-1, Hirosawa
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP
For all designated states
Wako Pure Chemical Industies, Ltd.
1-2, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP
For all designated states
Nippon Genetech Co. Ltd.
Kongo Nishiki-cho, Bldg., 5, Kanda-Nishiki-cho, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0054 / JP
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
THE INSTITUTE OF PHYSICAL & CHEMICAL RESEARCH
2-1, Hirosawa
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP
For all designated states
Wako Pure Chemical Industies, Ltd.
1-2, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP
For all designated states
Hayashizaki, Yoshihide
The Institute of Physical and Chemical Research Tsukuba Life Science Centre, 1-1, Koyadai 3-chome
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0074 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HAYASHIZAKI, Yoshihide
1-1, Koyodai 3-chome
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0074 / JP
02 / OZAWA, Kaori, Wako Pure Chemical Industries, Ltd.
6-1, Takada-cho
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0963 / JP
03 / FUJIO, Kazunari, Wako Pure Chemical Ind. Ltd.
6-1, Takado-cho
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0963 / JP
04 / TANAKA, Takumi, Wako Pure Chemical Industries, Ltd
6-1, Takada-cho
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0963 / JP
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Godemeyer, Thomas
polypatent An den Gärten 7
51491 Overath / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Godemeyer, Thomas, Dr.
Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte An den Gärten 7
51491 Overath / DE
Application number, filing date98929852.606.07.1998
[2000/43]
WO1998JP03038
Priority number, dateJP1997018087907.07.1997         Original published format: JP 18087997
JP1998015577404.06.1998         Original published format: JP 15577498
[2000/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902543
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1046648
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07H19/10, C07H19/20, C12Q1/68, C07H21/00
[2002/37]
Former International [2000/43]C07H19/10, C07H19/14, C07H19/20, C12Q1/68
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/43]
TitleGerman:3'-DESOXYRIBONUKLEOTID-DERIVATE[2000/43]
English:3'-DEOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDE DERIVATIVES[2000/43]
French:DERIVES DE 3'-DESOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDE[2000/43]
Entry into regional phase22.03.1999Translation filed 
22.03.1999National basic fee paid 
22.03.1999Search fee paid 
28.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/43]
23.09.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT
05.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/32]
21.03.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.05.1999AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999CH   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999
21.05.1999CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999DE   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999
21.05.1999DK   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999
21.05.1999ES   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999
21.05.1999FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999FR   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999
21.05.1999GB   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999
21.05.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999IT   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999
21.05.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999NL   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999
21.05.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999SE   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200609   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5332666  (PROBER JAMES M [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * examples 5-8; claims 1-14 *;
 [Y]US5151507  (HOBBS JR FRANK W [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9749769  (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [PX] 1-12 * the whole document, but especially claims 16-24 *;
 [E]EP0978569  (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO [JP], et al) [E] 1-12 * the whole document, but especially claims 19-24 *
International search[XP]JPH10158293  (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO, et al);
 [Y]JPH04320699  (NISSHIN SPINNING);
 [Y]JPH085908B  ;
 [XP]  - SASAKI N., ET AL., "TRANSCRIPTIONAL SEQUENCING: A METHOD FOR DNA SEQUENCING USING RNA POLYMERASE.", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19980331), vol. 95., doi:10.1073/pnas.95.7.3455, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3455 - 3460., XP002912287

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.7.3455
 [Y]  - AXELROD V. D., KRAMER F. R., "TRANSCRIPTION FROM BACTERIOPHAGE T7 AND SP6 RNA POLYMERASE PROMOTERS IN THE PRESENCE OF 3'-DEOXYRIBONUCLEOSIDE 5'-TRIPHOSPHATE CHAIN TERMINATORS.", Biochemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19850101), vol. 24., doi:10.1021/bi00342a005, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 5716 - 5723., XP002912288

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00342a005