Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001749

EP1001749 - PROLIPOSOME POWDERS FOR INHALATION STABILISED BY TOCOPHEROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2000/21]
Inventor(s)01 / BYSTRÖM, Katarina
Astra Draco AB P.O. Box 34
S-221 00 Lund / SE
02 / NILSSON, Per-Gunnar
Astra Draco AB P.O. Box 34
S-221 00 Lund / SE
[2000/21]
Application number, filing date98929963.108.06.1998
[2000/21]
WO1998SE01090
Priority number, dateUS1997088441927.06.1997         Original published format: US 884419
[2000/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900111
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1001749
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/127, A61K9/72, A61K47/22
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
Extension statesLT27.01.2000
LV27.01.2000
MK27.01.2000
RO27.01.2000
SI27.01.2000
TitleGerman:PROLIPOSOMPUDER ZUR INHALATION VON STABILISIERTEM TOCOPHEROL[2000/21]
English:PROLIPOSOME POWDERS FOR INHALATION STABILISED BY TOCOPHEROL[2000/21]
French:POUDRES DE PROLIPOSOMES STABILISEES PAR TOCOPHEROL ET DESTINEES A L'INHALATION[2000/21]
Entry into regional phase27.01.2000National basic fee paid 
27.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
27.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
17.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/48]
17.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9619199  (ASTRA AB [SE], et al)
 [A]  - STN INTERNATIONAL, File CAPLUS, CAPLUS Accession No. 1990:637726, BAE SONG JA et al., "A Study of Stabilization Effect of .alpha. - Tocopherol Incorporated Into Liposomal Phospholipid Membrane"; & ARCH. PHARMACOL. RES., (1990), 13(1), 64-8.,
 [A]  - STN INTERNATIONAL, File CAPLUS, CAPLUS Accession No. 1990:42475, THOMA K. et al., "Influence of Composition and Manufacturing Technique on Size and Homogeneity of Small Unilamellar Liposomes"; & CONGR. INT. TECHNOL. PHARM., 5th, (1989), Volume 3, 15-24.,