Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992122

EP0992122 - MOBILE STATION SYNCHRONIZATION WITHIN A SPREAD SPECTRUM COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/18]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2003/22]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / DAHLMAN, Erik
Tackjärnsvägen 12
S-168 68 Bromma / SE
02 / GUSTAFSSON, Maria
Medborgarplatsen 11
S-118 26 Stockholm / SE
03 / ESMAILZADEH, Riaz
Century II 305, 286, Mijazaki, Miamae-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 216 / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98929988.812.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998SE01138
Priority number, dateUS1997088400227.06.1997         Original published format: US 884002
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900912
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992122
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992122
Date:28.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/707
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/15]
TitleGerman:MOBILSTATIONSSYNCHRONISATION IN EINEM SPREIZSPEKTRUMNACHRICHTENÜBERTRAGUNSSYSTEM[2002/49]
English:MOBILE STATION SYNCHRONIZATION WITHIN A SPREAD SPECTRUM COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM[2000/15]
French:SYNCHRONISATION D'UNE STATION MOBILE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS A SPECTRE DISPERSE[2000/15]
Former [2000/15]MOBILSTATIONSYSNCHRONISATION IN EINEM SPREIZSPEKTRUMNACHRICHTENÜBERTRAGUNSSYSTEM
Entry into regional phase13.12.1999National basic fee paid 
13.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
13.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
02.08.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
28.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
16.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2003Fee for grant paid
24.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9315573  (MILLICOM HOLDINGS UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1,6,12 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 5 * * page 4, line 26 - line 30 * * page 9, line 3 - line 14; figure 7 * * page 32, line 7 - line 15; figure 5 *;
 [A]US4943974  (MOTAMEDI MASOUD [US]) [A] 1,6,12 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 19 * * column 2, line 38 - line 68 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 2; figure 3 * * column 7, line 61 - line 67; figure 8 *;
 [A]EP0744840  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6,12 * column 5, line 24 - line 28 *
Examination US5416797