Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992165

EP0992165 - SOFTWARE HLR ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / JELLEMA, Bart
Schoorvexen 47
NL-5121 NJ Rijen / NL
02 / TOM, Wayne
2590 Bourgoin Street
St. Laurent, Quebec H4R 2C3 / CA
03 / NGUYEN, Viet
6440 McLynn Avenue
Quebec, Quebec H3X 2R4 / CA
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Sjöberg, Mats Hakan , et al
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Kista
RAN Implementation & Core (PU-KRIC)
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/01]Sjöberg, Mats Hakan , et al
Ericsson AB, Patent Unit Radio Networks
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2001/16]Wennerholm, Kristian , et al
Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Unit Radio Access
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/15]Wennerholm, Kristian , et al
Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date98930012.418.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998SE01194
Priority number, dateUS19970050457P23.06.1997         Original published format: US 50457 P
US1998006271320.04.1998         Original published format: US 62713
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9859507
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992165
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/24
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:SOFTWARE HLR ARCHITEKTUR[2000/16]
English:SOFTWARE HLR ARCHITECTURE[2000/15]
French:ARCHITECTURE DE LOGICIEL DE REGISTRE ELN[2000/15]
Former [2000/15]SOFTWARE HLR ARCHITEKTEN
Entry into regional phase10.12.1999National basic fee paid 
10.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
10.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
19.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/40]
03.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5353331  (EMERY MARK J [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 9, line 28 - line 43 * * column 20, line 15 - line 40 * * column 27, line 43 - column 28, line 14 * * column 31, line 25 - line 68 *;
 [X]US5457736  (CAIN MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 3, line 1 - line 24 * * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 34; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9526114  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 6 - line 29 * * page 6, line 37 - page 7, line 10 *;
 [PX]WO9727713  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [PX] 1-11 * column W *
 [A]  - BALAKRISHNAN A, "WIRELESS AND SERVICE MOBILITY", ANNUAL REVIEW OF COMMUNICATIONS, (1997), vol. 50, pages 859 - 865, XP000720953 [A] 1-11 * column W *
 [A]  - VANWELSENAERS A ET AL, "ARCHITECTURE OF CELLULAR NETWORKS AND EXAMPLE OF INTELLIGENT NETWORKS", REVUE HF, (19940101), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 37 - 43, XP000460096 [A] 1-11 * page 41, column L, line 7 - line 32 *