EP1018984 - MEDICAL DEVICE FOR $i(IN VIVO) NITRIC OXIDE RELEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | For all designated states Papandreou, George 202 Crestview Road Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | For all designated states Narayanan, Pallassana V. 5601 Carriage Lane Davie, FL 33331 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | ||
For all designated states Papandreou, George 202 Crestview Road Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | |||
For all designated states Narayanan, Pallassana V. 5601 Carriage Lane Davie, FL 33331 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPANDREOU, George 202 Crestview Road Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 02 /
NARAYANAN, Pallassana, V. 5601 Carriage Lane Davie, FL 33331 / US | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98930111.4 | 08.06.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998US12002 | Priority number, date | US19970882880 | 26.06.1997 Original published format: US 882880 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9900070 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1018984 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.01.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/02, A61L33/00 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
A61L33/027 (EP,US);
A61L33/0076 (EP,US);
A61L33/0088 (EP,US);
Y10S623/901 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/29] | A61F2/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2000/29] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR FREISETZUNG VON STICKSTOFFEN | [2000/29] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE FOR $i(IN VIVO) NITRIC OXIDE RELEASE | [2000/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEDICAL CON U POUR LA LIBERATION DU MONOXYDE D'AZOTE $i(IN VIVO) | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.07.2006 | 27.06.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/49] | 12.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.07.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9635416 (NITROMED INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 11, paragraph 2; claims 25-29 * * page 36, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9422306 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US]) | International search | [X]US5443955 (CORNELL BRUCE A [AU], et al); | [X]US5336518 (NARAYANAN PALLASSANA V [US], et al) |