Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989811

EP0989811 - TOWABLE CARRYING CASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.07.2003  [2003/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OUTRIGGER, Inc.
21 Pond Hill Road
Chappaqua, New York 10514 / US
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / SADOW, Bernard, D.
21 Pond Hill Road
Chappaqua, NY 10514 / US
02 / SCHWAB, Jeffrey, A.
141 A Old Hyde Road
Weston, CT 06883 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Howick, Nicholas Keith , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Howick, Nicholas Keith , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date98930150.208.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998US12162
Priority number, dateUS1997087147209.06.1997         Original published format: US 871472
US1998000531309.01.1998         Original published format: US 5313
US1998001557130.01.1998         Original published format: US 15571
US1998005610406.04.1998         Original published format: US 56104
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9856274
Date:17.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0989811
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:A45C5/00, A45C13/26, A45C13/00, B62B1/00, A45C5/14
[2001/51]
Former International [2000/14]A45C5/00, A45C13/26, A45C13/00, B62B1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/14]
TitleGerman:TRANSPORTKOFFER ZUM HINTERHERZIEHEN[2000/14]
English:TOWABLE CARRYING CASE[2000/14]
French:MALLETTE DE TRANSPORT REMORQUABLE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2000National basic fee paid 
10.01.2000Search fee paid 
10.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
11.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/28]
06.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
10.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200104   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.2001
30.06.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5407039  (ALPER BRAD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document * [Y] 3,7-10;
 [Y]US4397062  (HUANG JINN T [TW]) [Y] 3,7-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4852705  (COWAN JR SAMUEL C [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2124589  (CHIH CHANG CHIANG) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5407039