Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991577

EP0991577 - PACKAGE WITH A SMOOTH, GAS-PERMEABLE SUBSTRATE ON ITS BOTTOM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A, P.O. Box 464 Duncan
South Carolina 29334 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A, P.O. Box 464
Duncan, South Carolina 29334 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRADY, Sean, A.
106 W. Celestial Drive
Greer, SC 29651 / US
02 / LOGAN, Robin, H.
313 Fieldsedge Drive
Moore, SC 29369 / US
03 / NOEL, David, C.
4001 Pelham Road 284
Greer, SC 29650 / US
04 / STOCKLEY, H., Walker, III
405 Thornhill Drive
Spartanburg, SC 29301 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Barlow, Roy James
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Barlow, Roy James
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98930169.212.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998US12244
Priority number, dateUS1997087838618.06.1997         Original published format: US 878386
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9857868
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991577
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991577
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B65D81/24, B65D77/20, B65D75/26
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VERPACKUNG MIT EINEM GLATTEN UND GASDURCHLÄSSIGEN SUBSTRAT AM BODEN[2000/15]
English:PACKAGE WITH A SMOOTH, GAS-PERMEABLE SUBSTRATE ON ITS BOTTOM[2000/15]
French:EMBALLAGE A FOND RECOUVERT D'UN SUBSTRAT LISSE PERMEABLE AUX GAZ[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase22.11.1999National basic fee paid 
22.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
29.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2003Fee for grant paid
24.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.09.2003
BE10.09.2003
CH10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
IT10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
DE11.12.2003
PT18.12.2003
ES21.12.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2004/46]AT10.09.2003
BE10.09.2003
CH10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
DE11.12.2003
PT18.12.2003
ES21.12.2003
Former [2004/44]AT10.09.2003
BE10.09.2003
CH10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
DE11.12.2003
PT18.12.2003
Former [2004/41]AT10.09.2003
BE10.09.2003
CH10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
PT18.12.2003
Former [2004/31]AT10.09.2003
BE10.09.2003
CH10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
PT18.12.2003
Former [2004/28]AT10.09.2003
BE10.09.2003
CH10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
Former [2004/22]AT10.09.2003
CH10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
Former [2004/16]AT10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
Former [2004/14]AT10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
Former [2004/12]FI10.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0690012  (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [A] 1-5,7,8,12-16,18-26 * abstract *;
 [A]GB1097637  (AMERICAN CAN CO) [A] 1,8,12,19,20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3713849  (GRINDROD P, et al) [A] 1,3-5,7-10,20,22-25,27 * column W *
ExaminationWO9639341
otherUS4055672
 US4910033
 US5686126