blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0991699 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0991699



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 404
28.02.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.03.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
18.01.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.01.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
18.01.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
31.10.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
18.10.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
08.08.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.08.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.08.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 50
29.12.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
29.12.2000 Description Search / examination 3
29.12.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.12.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
30.10.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.10.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.08.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
26.06.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
26.06.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.04.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
26.04.2000 Priority document Search / examination 63
01.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.02.2000 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
02.02.2000 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 2
26.01.2000 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
07.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
13.10.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
28.06.1999 Urgent incoming letter International Searching Authority 5
17.06.1999 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
13.04.1999 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) International Searching Authority 1
09.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
06.02.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
07.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 42
14.12.1998 Copy of the international search report International Searching Authority 3
14.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 56
13.10.1998 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 4
11.09.1998 Request for extension of time limit International Searching Authority 2
11.09.1998 Request for extension of time limit International Searching Authority 1
26.08.1998 Request for extension of time limit International Searching Authority 2
17.06.1998 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
17.06.1998 Claims International Searching Authority 7
17.06.1998 Claims International Searching Authority 7
17.06.1998 Description International Searching Authority 37
17.06.1998 Description International Searching Authority 37
17.06.1998 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
17.06.1998 Drawings International Searching Authority 4
17.06.1998 Drawings International Searching Authority 4
17.06.1998 Request for extension of time limit International Searching Authority 3