Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0991699


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.04.2008  [2008/16]
13.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.09.2004  [2004/40]
19.01.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.03.2004  [2004/10]
05.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.01.2004  [2004/04]
10.10.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2003  [2003/48]
26.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2003  [2003/46]
04.04.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.05.2003  [2003/21]
21.03.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.05.2003  [2003/19]
28.02.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.04.2003  [2003/16]
28.02.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  16.04.2003  [2003/16]
17.01.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.03.2003  [2003/10]
11.01.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2003  [2003/09]
30.08.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.10.2002  [2002/42]
08.03.2002 (Expected) grant published on  24.04.2002  [2002/17]
08.03.2002 Change - priority published on  24.04.2002  [2002/17]
11.02.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.10.2001 Communication of intention to grant
26.10.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.07.2001 Communication of intention to grant
14.06.2001 Renewal fee
04.01.2001 Examination report or reply
27.10.2000 Examination report or reply
23.06.2000 First examination report
21.06.2000 Renewal fee
20.06.2000 Examination report or reply
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
25.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
28.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
01.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
05.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication