blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0991699
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9858012Global Dossier 23.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
US87762497 18.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0991699Global Dossier 24.04.2002B1
EP0991699 12.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9812553 17.06.1998
US87762497 18.06.1997
US9862098 17.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT216712T 15.05.2002T
Priority number Date
US9812553 17.06.1998
US87762497 18.06.1997
US9862098 17.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU746351B 18.04.2002B2
AU7972198 04.01.1999A
Priority number Date
US9812553 17.06.1998
US87762497 18.06.1997
US9862098 17.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69805071T 14.11.2002T2
DE69805071D 29.05.2002D1
Priority number Date
US9812553 17.06.1998
US87762497 18.06.1997
US9862098 17.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2002515939Global Dossier 28.05.2002A
Priority number Date
US9812553 17.06.1998
US87762497 18.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2295209 23.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
US9812553 17.06.1998
US87762497 18.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6008318 28.12.1999A
Priority number Date
US87762497 18.06.1997
US9862098 17.06.1998