EP0991699 - TWO-STAGE SOLUTION POLYMERIZATION OF HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLY(PHOSPHOESTERS) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUILFORD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 6611 Tributary Street Baltimore, Maryland 21224 / US | For all designated states THE JOHNS HOPKINS UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE Suite 72-100, 2024 East Monument Baltimore, MD 21205 / US | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Zhong 2320 F. Tarleton Lane Baltimore, MD 21234 / US | 02 /
MAO, Hai-Quan Apartment C8, 334 Stephenson Lane Towsen, MD 21204 / US | 03 /
LEONG, Kam, W. 10242 Breconshire Road Ellicott City, MD 21043 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph, et al Office de Brevets Ernest T. Freylinger 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 98930301.1 | 17.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998US12553 | Priority number, date | USA 877624 | 18.06.1997 | USA 98620 | 17.06.1998 | [2002/17] |
Former [2002/17] | US19970877624 | 18.06.1997 | |
[2000/15] | 25.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/15] | USA 877624 | 18.06.1997 | |
USA | 17.06.1998 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9858012 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991699 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991699 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08G79/04 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
C08G79/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | ZWEISTUFIGE LÖSUNGSPOLYMERISATION VON HOCHMOLEKULAREN POLY(PHOSPHORESTERN) | [2000/15] | English: | TWO-STAGE SOLUTION POLYMERIZATION OF HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLY(PHOSPHOESTERS) | [2000/15] | French: | POLYMERISATION EN SOLUTION EN DEUX PHASES DE POLY(PHOSPHOESTER) DE MASSE MOLECULAIRE ELEVEE | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 26.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.04.2002 | BE | 24.04.2002 | CH | 24.04.2002 | FI | 24.04.2002 | GR | 24.04.2002 | IT | 24.04.2002 | LI | 24.04.2002 | NL | 24.04.2002 | CY | 30.06.2002 | DK | 24.07.2002 | PT | 24.07.2002 | SE | 24.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
BE | 24.04.2002 | ||
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
FI | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
CY | 30.06.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
BE | 24.04.2002 | ||
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
CY | 30.06.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
BE | 24.04.2002 | ||
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
BE | 24.04.2002 | ||
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 24.04.2002 | |
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 24.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5021093 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 20-38 * tables 1,2 *; | [X]EP0386757 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [X] 20-38 * examples 1-6; claims 1-15 *; | [X] - MAO HAI-QUAN ET AL., "Synthesis and Biological Properties of Polymer Immunoadjuvants", POLYMER JOURNAL, (1993), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 499 - 505, XP002074189 [X] 20-38 * figure 1; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1295/polymj.25.499 | [X] - Host: STN, Database CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 122, no. 11, 13 March 1995 Columbus, Ohio, US: abstract no. 122613 LUO, YI ET AL.: "Synthesis and antitumor activity of biodegradable poly- phosphamides", XP002074190 [X] 20-38 * see abstract in connection with file REGISTRY, RN 161079-23-8, RN 161079-25-0, RN 161079-27-2, RN 161079-29-4 * | [X] - Host: STN, Database CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 124, no. 18, 18 April 1996 Columbus, Ohio, US: abstract no 241898 FAN, CHANG-LIE ET AL.: "Studies on the drug controlled release materials of polyphosphate containing tyrosine ester", XP002074191 [X] 20-38 * see abstract in connection with file REGISTRY, RN 174753-10-7, RN 174753-11-8, RN 174753-12-9, RN 174753-13-0, RN 174753-14-1 * |