blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1000173

EP1000173 - HIGH-THROUGHPUT SCREENING METHOD FOR IDENTIFICATION OF GENETIC MUTATIONS OR DISEASE-CAUSING MICROORGANISMS USING SEGMENTED PRIMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Exact Sciences Corporation
100 Campus Drive
Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/10]For all designated states
EXACT Sciences Corporation
100 Campus Drive
Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US
Former [2001/37]For all designated states
Exact Sciences Corporation
63 Great Road
Maynard, MA 01754 / US
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
Exact Laboratories, Inc.
63 Great Road
Maynard, MA 01754 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SHUBER, Anthony, P.
11 Grant Street
Milford, MA 01757 / US
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Crump, Julian Richard John, et al
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo
Intellectual Property LLP
Alder Castle
10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/40]Crump, Julian Richard John, et al
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane
London EC2V 8EY / GB
Former [2000/20]Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al
Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date98930316.916.06.1998
[2000/20]
WO1998US12589
Priority number, dateUS1997087733316.06.1997         Original published format: US 877333
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9858084
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1000173
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:C12Q1/68
[2000/20]
CPC:
C12Q1/6827 (EP,US); C12Q1/6869 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C12Q1/6827, C12Q2565/501, C12Q2525/204, C12Q2525/107 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2565/501, C12Q2525/204, C12Q2525/107 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/20]
TitleGerman:TESTVERFAHREN MIT HOHER DURCHSATZRATE ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON GENETISCHEN MUTATIONEN ODER PATHOGENEN MICROORGANISMEN MITTELS SEGMENTIERTER PRIMER[2000/20]
English:HIGH-THROUGHPUT SCREENING METHOD FOR IDENTIFICATION OF GENETIC MUTATIONS OR DISEASE-CAUSING MICROORGANISMS USING SEGMENTED PRIMERS[2000/20]
French:PROCEDE D'ANALYSE A HAUT RENDEMENT POUR L'IDENTIFICATION DE MUTATIONS GENETIQUES OU DE MICRO-ORGANISMES PATHOGENES, AU MOYENS D'AMORCES SEGMENTEES[2000/20]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2000National basic fee paid 
07.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
23.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/14]
05.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO8911211  (BIOTECHNOLOG FORSCHUNG GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [DY]WO9113075  (ORION YHTYMAE OY [FI]) [DY] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [DY]WO9215712  (MOLECULAR TOOL INC [US]) [DY] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9520680  (HYBRIDON INC [US]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2293238  (INCELTEC LTD [GB], et al) [A] * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO9630545  (APPLIED GENETICS INC [US]) [DA] * the whole document *;
 [PY]WO9813522  (DYNAL AS [NO], et al) [PY] 1-27* the whole document *;
 [Y]  - KOTLER ET AL., "DNA SEQUENCING: MODULAR PRIMERS ASEMBLED FROM A LIBRARY OF HEXAMERS OR PENTAMERS", PNAS, (1993), vol. 90, pages 4241 - 4245, XP002079631 [Y] 1-27 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.9.4241
 [Y]  - KIELECZAWA J ET AL, "DNA SEQUENCING BY PRIMER WALKING WITH STRINGS OF CONTIGUOUS HEXAMERS", SCIENCE, (19921211), vol. 258, no. 5089, pages 1787 - 1791, XP000371882 [Y] 1-27 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1465615
 [Y]  - BESKIN A D ET AL, "ON THE MECHANISM OF THE MODULAR PRIMER EFFECT", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 23, no. 15, pages 2881 - 2885, XP002054940 [Y] 1-27 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.